MacDonald, Jillian Michelle (CPSO#: 97792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
In Medic
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone: (519) 601-7171
Fax: (519) 601-7174
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jillian M. MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Campbell ( CPSO# 98334 )
Dr. J. Macdonald ( CPSO# 97792 )

Business Address:
In Medic
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILLIAN MICHELLE MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014