MacDougall, Andrea Melissa (CPSO#: 88149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Fax: (807) 345-0099
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. M. MacDougall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. MacDougall ( CPSO# 88149 )

Business Address:
1165 Barton Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone Number: (807) 345-3355

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Centre
Physicians Lounge
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MELISSA MACDOUGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDOUGALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Mar 2008 to 11 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011