MacKenzie, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 80756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: Scarrow, Susan Elizabeth (used until: 26 May 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 3606
Fax: (416) 469-6179
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan MacKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. MacKenzie ( CPSO# 80756 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
1205-1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 233-8933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 09 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2007 to 09 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010