MacKenzie-Feder, Jessica Mariam (CPSO#: 90391)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 May 2009 to 28 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 22 Nov 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2011