MacKinnon, David James (CPSO#: 72222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: (416) 864-5341
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

One Blue Jays Way
Toronto ON  M5V 1J1
Canada
Phone: (416) 341-1142
Fax: (416) 341-1103
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. J. MacKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. MacKinnon ( CPSO# 72222 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Business Address:
1 Blue Jays Way
Toronto ON  M5V 1J1
Phone Number: (416) 341-3112

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000