MacKinnon, William Frederick (CPSO#: 91617)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: Ezzat, Tarek Frederick (used until: 22 Mar 2015 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Thunder Bay ON  P7B6V4
Phone: 4039570543
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FREDERICK MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2015