MacLean, David Alexander (CPSO#: 90330)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 19 Oct 2011 to 15 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2011