MacLeod, Olivia Mary Jane (CPSO#: 90601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
311 McArthur Avenue
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 738-6990
Fax: (613) 738-4891
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olivia MacLeod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. MacLeod ( CPSO# 90601 )

Business Address:
311 McArthur Avenue
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone Number: (613) 738-6990

Business Address:
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLIVIA MARY JANE MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014