MacNeil, Stephanie Danielle (CPSO#: 92649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8767
Fax: (519) 685-8567
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Danielle MacNeil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. MacNeil ( CPSO# 92649 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Otolaryngology
Suite B3 433
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8767

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DANIELLE MACNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNEIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2010 to 23 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012