MacPhail, Janet Elspeth (CPSO#: 32059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o 113-688 Fairchild Road
Vancouver BC  V5Z 4P7
Phone: (807) 707-0360
Fax: 250-900-0374

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ELSPETH MACPHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACPHAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1995