MacSween, Ruth Margaret (CPSO#: 74503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Cambridge, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Limestone Dermatology
163 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1S2
Phone: (613) 549-6660
Fax: (613) 547-2079
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. MacSween Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. MacSween ( CPSO# 74503 )

Business Address:
163 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1S2
Phone Number: (613) 549-6660

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH MARGARET MACSWEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACSWEEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001