MacSweeney, Orla Maeve (CPSO#: 78463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 5214
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Orla MacSweeney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. MacSweeney ( CPSO# 78463 )

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ORLA MAEVE MACSWEENEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACSWEENEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Aug 2002 to 07 Sep 2002
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014