Macdonald, Kristian Ian (CPSO#: 92446)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. I. Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 05 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017