Mace, Frank Jan (CPSO#: 51066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank J. Mace Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 2, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frank Jan Mace in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mace to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Mace has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: August 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Findings:

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.

The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

1. On August 22, 2017, Frank Mace was found guilty of having care and control of a motor vehicle while impaired by alcohol contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. Dr. Mace is prohibited from operating a motor vehicle on any street, road, highway or other public place for a period of 12 months from August 22, 2017. Dr. Mace was also ordered to pay a fine of $1,300, plus a victim surcharge of $390.