Macedo Lamacie, Mariana (CPSO#: 110873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 13 Oct 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 14 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mariana Macedo Lamacie may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Macedo
                        Lamacie holds an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires seven  years  from
                  the date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Macedo Lamacie no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Macedo Lamacie's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Macedo Lamacie's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following  consideration   of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2018, and expires on June 30, 2021.
                  Upon  renewal  of  Dr.  Macedo  Lamacie's  academic  appointment  at  the
                  University  of  Ottawa,  the  expiry date can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.