Macfabe, Derrick Fraser (CPSO#: 65628)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Mar 1995
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 1995 to 31 May 1995
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995