Macgroarty, Kelly Armstrong (CPSO#: 82134)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 23 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005