Mach, Zi Hymn (CPSO#: 106256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-525-9140
Electoral District: 04

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 14 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr. Zi Hymn Mach shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate
                  medical education program in which Dr. Mach is enrolled at McMaster
                  University.

            (2)   In Dr. Mach's practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr.
                  Mach  shall  prescribe  drugs  only  for in-patients or out-patients of a
                  clinical teaching unit that is formally  affiliated  with  the department
                  where Dr. Mach is properly practising medicine and to which  postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its  program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Mach's practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr.
                  Mach shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr.  Mach  may  practise  internal  medicine  and  to  the  extent of his
                  employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton,  while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In  Dr.  Mach's  practice  specified  in paragraph (4), Dr. Mach may  not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate of registration expires,  and  Dr.  Mach  must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Mach  is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr.  Mach no longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship,  permanent
                        resident status,  or  a  valid  employment  authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts  to  a  regular   Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate and Dr.  Mach must immediately cease all  practice
                  outside the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  if any one of the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies  the College of
                        any  concerns  regarding  Dr.  Mach's practice, including  but  not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Mach's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval   for  Dr.   Mach  to  engage  in  practice  outside   the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Mach's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Mach  takes  a  leave  of  absence,  or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the  event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate   Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Mach  may  not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate  medical education program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy  until  Dr.  Mach  applies  for a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  24,  2018.   In accordance  with
                  paragraph  6(a),  this certificate of registration expires  on  June  30,
                  2019.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside  the   postgraduate   medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.