Macher, Ted Williams (CPSO#: 93084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1800 8 St E
Department of Emergency Medicine
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5N3
Phone: 519-376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ted Macher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Macher ( CPSO# 93084 )

Business Address:
CKHA Public General Hospital Campus
Department of Family Medicine
PO Box 2030
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5N3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TED WILLIAMS MACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012