Mackenzie, Anna Katherine Giles (CPSO#: 106499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TEHN Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Primacy - Carlton & Church Medical
60 Carlton St
Toronto ON  M5B1J2
Canada
Phone: 416-646-1890
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A5T8
Canada
Phone: 519-508-1212
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M1L0
Canada
Phone: 519-482-3000
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA KATHERINE GILES MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017