Mackenzie, Constance Alexa (CPSO#: 84222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street, Rm B2-047
London, ON
N6A 4V
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 66065
Fax: 519-646-6119
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Constance A. Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mackenzie ( CPSO# 84222 )
Dr. R. Mackenzie ( CPSO# 19725 )

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B2-047
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6065

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONSTANCE ALEXA MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011