Macklin, Gloria Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Children's Treatment Centre
395 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Phone: (613) 737-0871 Ext. 2294
Fax: (613) 523-5167
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Macklin Forse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Macklin ( CPSO# 58188 )
Dr. R. Forse ( CPSO# 63698 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Ottawa Children's Treatment Centre
395 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Phone Number: (613) 737-0871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLORIA ELIZABETH MACKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1989