Macmillan, Karen Diane (CPSO#: 93386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
3350 Merrittville Hwy
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: (905) 688 8118
Fax: 905 378 3039
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen D. Macmillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Macmillan ( CPSO# 93386 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2

Business Address:
10 - 3350 Merrittville Hwy
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone Number: (905) 688-8118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN DIANE MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015