Madan, Monika Krishna (CPSO#: 79194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lake Shore Blvd West, Unit 107
Toronto ON  M8V 0B1
Phone: 416-800-6500 Ext. 2
Fax: 416-342-1790
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bay Centre for Birth Control
3rd Floor, Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 351-3700
Fax: (416) 351-3727
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monika Madan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Madan ( CPSO# 79194 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
2240 Lakeshore Boulevard
Toronto ON  M8V 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 800-6500

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 351-3700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIKA KRISHNA MADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005