Madhvani, Amar Ashwin (CPSO#: 95826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
799 Bloor Street W
Toronto ON  M6G1L8
Phone: (647) 349-0053
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Welington St W
Barrie ON  L4N 1K9
Canada
Phone: 705-739-0127
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amar Madhvani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Madhvani ( CPSO# 105064)
Dr. A. Madhvani ( CPSO# 95826 )

Business Address:
799 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 1L8
Phone Number: (647) 349-0053

Business Address:
200 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1K9
Phone Number: (705) 739-0127

Business Address:
19-1118 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7R9
Phone Number: (905) 479-9902

Business Address:
2077 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 4C2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMAR ASHWIN MADHVANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADHVANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013