Magalhaes, Joyce Kellen Rodrigues De Souza (CPSO#: 96105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal De Goias, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Department of Anesthesia
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magalhaes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Magalhaes ( CPSO# 96105 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE KELLEN RODRIGUES DE SOUZA MAGALHAES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGALHAES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017