Magar, Janice Diane (CPSO#: 67270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Legere, Janice Diane (used until: 05 Mar 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 123
Petawawa ON  K8H 1X0
Phone: 613-875-2664
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magar Weisgerber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Weisgerber ( CPSO# 69616 )
Dr. J. Magar ( CPSO# 67270 )

Business Address:
PO Box 123
Petawawa ON  K8H 1X0

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE DIANE MAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1993