Magder, Ilana (CPSO#: 91277)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 335
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 899-6116
Fax: (416) 590-1932
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilana Magder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Magder ( CPSO# 91277 )

Business Address:
335 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 899-6116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILANA MAGDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2010