Magee, Bryden Alexandra (CPSO#: 92938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa Fertility Centre
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Stuart Street
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Suite 202,
1473 John Counter Boulevard
Kingston ON  K7M 8Z6
Canada
Phone: 613-417-1931
Fax: 613-417-1932
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.K. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Magee ( CPSO# 92938 )
Dr. A. Hall ( CPSO# 88606 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYDEN ALEXANDRA MAGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 06 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2016