Maggio, Frederick Joseph (CPSO#: 33662)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: Maggio, Frederick James (used until: 21 May 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018