Maghrabi, Khalid Abdul-Razzag A (CPSO#: 74096)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001