Mah, Kim Bill (CPSO#: 72161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
9th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4549
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health - Clarke Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bill Mah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mah ( CPSO# 72161 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
927 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Cantre for Addiction and Mental Health
Clarke Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM BILL MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2003