Mah, Leevin (CPSO#: 73942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1821 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 0H6
Phone: (905) 335-5959
Fax: (905) 335-4757
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leevin Mah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mah ( CPSO# 73942 )

Business Address:
1821 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 0H6
Phone Number: (905) 335-5959

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Feb 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEEVIN MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2002