Mah, Norman Albert (CPSO#: 74985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Care Services
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2R8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: (905) 873-4586
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

470 Chrysler Dr
Brampton ON  L6S 6G3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-9030
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2225 Erin Mills Pkwy
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T8
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Canada
Phone: (905) 607-0022
Fax: (905) 607-0013
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-0997
Fax: (416) 597-2912
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1142 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 304-0062
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 569-7007
Fax: (905) 569-7056
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman Mah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mah ( CPSO# 74985 )

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (647) 228-6888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Oct 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN ALBERT MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2003