Mah-Poy, Kimberly Ann (CPSO#: 73984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Health Centre
7th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7424
Fax: (416) 867-3654
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mah-Poy ( CPSO# 73984 )
Dr. M. Kargel ( CPSO# 73398 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANN MAH-POY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH-POY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003