Maharaj, Siobhan Clare Deonarine (CPSO#: 73545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
230 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4P5
Phone: (519) 633-0038
Fax: (519) 633-0135
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Siobhan Maharaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Maharaj ( CPSO# 73545 )

Business Address:
107 - 230 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4P5
Phone Number: (519) 633-0038

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIOBHAN CLARE DEONARINE MAHARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001