Mahdawi, Najia Albashir (CPSO#: 85388)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PEAP - Resident - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2008