Mahe, Etienne Raymond (CPSO#: 91170)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Foothills Medical Centre 6th Floor 1403 29 Street Northwest Calgary, AB T2N 2T9
Date Received: 27 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 16 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015