Maheshwari, Anil Kumar (CPSO#: 91425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cleveland Clinic Canada
Brookfield Place
181 Bay Street
Suite 3000
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017


Corporation Name: Anil Maheshwari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maheshwari ( CPSO# 91425 )

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Business Address:
181 Bay Street
30th Floor
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 507-6600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Dec 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Anil  Kumar  Maheshwari  may  practise  medicine  independently  in family
            medicine only.