Mahfud, Abdulaati Salem (CPSO#: 92288)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2009 to 27 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2013