Mahler, Ronald Heinrich (CPSO#: 56584)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Mahler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: mahlers@tbaytel.net
Date Received: 26 Nov 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Feb 2016