Mahmood, Naseeruddin (CPSO#: 70794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  14 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kennedy Medical Clinic
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Phone: 905-455-5445
Fax: 905-455-5665
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Torbram Medical Centre
105 Father Tobin Rd
Brampton ON  L6R 0W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 789-1750
Fax: 905-789-1787
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Mahmood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mahmood ( CPSO# 70794 )

Business Address:
Kennedy Medical Clinic
Suite 9
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 4L3
Phone Number: (905) 455-5445

Business Address:
Torbram Medical Centre
105 Father Tobin Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0W9
Phone Number: (905) 789-1750

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Naseeruddin  Mahmood may practise paediatrics at the Kennedy Medical
                  Clinic and the Torbram  Medical Centre, in Brampton, Ontario, while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  on  November 14,
                  2018.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Mahmood's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Mahmood's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining  to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Mahmood's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on November 15, 2016, and will expire  on  or
                  before November 14, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.