Mahmoud, Mohamed Ahmed Shaker (CPSO#: 85721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 663-2950
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Juliana Dr, Woodstock
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Mahmoud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahmoud ( CPSO# 85721 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED SHAKER MAHMOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2009