Mahmoud, Sarah (CPSO#: 93085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
928 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 1C6
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5059
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Mahmoud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mahmoud ( CPSO# 93085 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
928 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH MAHMOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012