Mahmoud, Shireen Farouk Abdel Hakim (CPSO#: 90086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Good Doctors Medical
1984 Regent Street
unit 126
Sudbury ON  P3E5S1
Phone: 705-805-0199
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIREEN FAROUK ABDEL HAKIM MAHMOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 05 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016