Mahmud, Aamer (CPSO#: 81278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Mar 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Center of South Eastern Onta
KGH. Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 8106
Fax: (613) 548-2399
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

166 Brock st. - Hotel Dieu Hospital
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: 6135442631 Ext. 8106
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. W. Mackillop ( CPSO# 32028 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: A. Mahmud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )

Business Address:
Kingston Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 27 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Aamer  Muhmud  may  practise  medicine independently in Radiation Oncology
            only.