Mahoney, Brian Andrew (CPSO#: 73787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington
County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: (613) 354-7157
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Mahoney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mahoney ( CPSO# 73787 )

Business Address:
Lennox and Addington
County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ANDREW MAHONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2007