Mahpour, Amirali (CPSO#: 108689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Victoria Hospital
Department of Respirology
E6-2016 - 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8094
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIRALI MAHPOUR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MAHPOUR is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. MAHPOUR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MAHPOUR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MAHPOUR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MAHPOUR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MAHPOUR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Apr 2016 to 06 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 May 2017 to 04 Jun 2017
Elective Trainee - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018