Mahtani, Ramona (CPSO#: 82950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for
Palliative Care 4th Floor, Box 13
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Parekh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Parekh ( CPSO# 82968 )
Dr. R. Mahtani ( CPSO# 82950 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite B2202
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 431-9713

Business Address:
Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-0185

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMONA MAHTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHTANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007