Mai, David Dung (CPSO#: 72641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palladium Sport Medicine Clinic
1000 Palladium Drive Box 103
Ottawa ON  K2V 1A4
Phone: (613) 599-0299
Fax: (613) 5990298
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CBI East
1400 St. Laurent Blvd. 4th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1K 4K4
Canada
Phone: (613) 7426108
Fax: (613) 7426109
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trang Mai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Trang ( CPSO# 77389 )
Dr. D. Mai ( CPSO# 72641 )

Business Address:
103 - 1000 Palladium Drive
Ottawa ON  K2V 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 599-0299

Business Address:
1400 St. Laurent Boulevard
4rth Floor
Ottawa ON  K1K 4K4

Business Address:
1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 0G1
Phone Number: (613) 254-9777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DUNG MAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2002